Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/29/2010