Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/08/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/18/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/01/2009