There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Full-Service Community Schools Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Education to award grants for the support of full-service community schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/09/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/09/2009Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/09/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/09/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/12/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor09/09/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/09/2009)

Full-Service Community Schools Act of 2009 - Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to authorize the Secretary of Education to award grants to: (1) consortia composed of a local educational agency and one or more community-based, nonprofit, or other public or private entities to assist public elementary or secondary schools to function as full-service community schools; and (2) state collaboratives to support the development of full-service community school programs.

Requires such schools to: (1) participate in community-based efforts to coordinate educational, developmental, family, health, and other comprehensive services through community-based organizations and public and private partnerships; and (2) provide access to such services to students, families, and the community.

Gives local grant priority to consortia that: (1) will serve at least two full-service community schools eligible for schoolwide programs under the Act, and more than one full-service community school as part of a community or districtwide strategy; (2) demonstrate a record of effectiveness in coordinating multiple qualified services; and (3) will be connected to a school and community partnership group that brings together key stakeholders across varied sectors to improve results for students and their families.

Establishes a Full-Service Community Schools Advisory Committee.