Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/14/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/22/2009