Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/10/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 09/10/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/10/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/10/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/10/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/26/2010