Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/27/2010