Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/23/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2010