Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/18/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/09/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/16/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/16/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/16/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/16/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/24/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/11/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/11/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/27/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/20/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/20/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010