Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/06/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/15/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/15/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/15/2009