There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Oilheat Research Alliance Reauthorization Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the National Oilheat Research Alliance Act of 2000.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/17/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/16/2009Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/16/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 09/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/07/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/09/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 12/19/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/23/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/16/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Environment09/17/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3589. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/2009)

National Oilheat Research Alliance Reauthorization Act of 2009 - Amends the National Oilheat Research Alliance Act of 2000 to extend the national oilheat research alliance program until February 6, 2011.