Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/16/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 09/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/07/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/09/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/19/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/23/2010