Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
03/23/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-148.
03/23/2010 Signed by President.
03/22/2010 Presented to President.
03/21/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by recorded vote: 219 - 212 (Roll no. 165).(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H1920-2152)
12/24/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 396.(text: CR S13890-14212)
10/08/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 768).(text: CR 10/7/2009 H10550)
09/17/2009 Introduced in House