Refined by:

Senate Remove

Limit your search

1-25 of 506
  1. S.Amdt.3298   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To amend the title.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/24/2009) (Proposed 12/24/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/24/09 Amendment SA 3298 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  2. S.Amdt.3297 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.3296 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.3295 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.3294 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.3293 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.3292 to S.Amdt.2878 (which amends S.Amdt.2786)   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the effective date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/20/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 SA 3292 fell when SA 2878 withdrawn.
  8. S.Amdt.3291 to S.Amdt.3290   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.3290   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.3289 to S.Amdt.3288 (which amends S.Amdt.2786)   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.3288 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.3287 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.3286 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.3285 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.3284 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  16. S.Amdt.3283 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.3282 to S.Amdt.3281 (which amends S.Amdt.3280)   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/21/09 SA 3282 fell when SA 3281 fell.
  18. S.Amdt.3281 to S.Amdt.3280   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/21/09 SA 3281 fell when SA 3280 fell.
  19. S.Amdt.3280   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/21/09 SA 3280 fell when cloture invoked on amendment SA 3276.
  20. S.Amdt.3279 to S.Amdt.3278   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 SA 3279 fell when SA 3278 tabled.
  21. S.Amdt.3278   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 Motion to table amendment SA 3278 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 386.
  22. S.Amdt.3277 to S.Amdt.3276 (which amends S.Amdt.2786)   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 Proposed amendment SA 3277 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13715-13716)
  23. S.Amdt.3276 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To improve the bill.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 Amendment SA 3276 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 387.
  24. S.Amdt.3275 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  25. S.Amdt.3274 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0