Limit your search

1-25 of 223
  1. S.Amdt.3297 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.3296 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.3295 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.3294 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.3293 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.3287 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.3286 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.3285 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.3284 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/20/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.3283 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/19/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.3275 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.3272 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.3271 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.3270 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.3269 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  16. S.Amdt.3268 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.3267 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  18. S.Amdt.3266 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  19. S.Amdt.3265 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  20. S.Amdt.3260 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  21. S.Amdt.3257 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  22. S.Amdt.3255 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  23. S.Amdt.3254 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  24. S.Amdt.3253 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  25. S.Amdt.3247 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0