Limit your search

1-11 of 11
  1. S.Amdt.3135 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2961 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2923 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2910 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2878 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the establishment of Offices of Minority Health.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Proposed amendment SA 2878 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13833)
  8. S.Amdt.2869 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2826 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To protect and improve guaranteed Medicare benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2826 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 357.
  10. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/15/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  11. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)