Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.3273 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3263 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  3. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  4. S.Amdt.3004 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.2923 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  6. S.Amdt.2883 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  7. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22