Limit your search

1-13 of 13
  1. S.Amdt.3175 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3102 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  3. S.Amdt.3069   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  4. S.Amdt.3037 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  5. S.Amdt.3031 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.2995 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  7. S.Amdt.2962 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prohibit the use of Federal funds for abortions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 12/07/2009) (Proposed 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 12/08/09 Motion to table amendment SA 2962 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 369. (consideration: CR S12683)
  8. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 10
  9. S.Amdt.2941 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  10. S.Amdt.2940 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  11. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  12. S.Amdt.2913 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  13. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18