Limit your search

1-10 of 10
  1. S.Amdt.3273 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/18/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3264 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  3. S.Amdt.3239 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  4. S.Amdt.3215 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  5. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  6. S.Amdt.3117 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  7. S.Amdt.3116 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  8. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 12
  9. S.Amdt.2997 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  10. S.Amdt.2898 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3