Limit your search

1-17 of 17
  1. S.Amdt.3221 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3185 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3131 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3085 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3037 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.3010 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.3009 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2991 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2957 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2929 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2903 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2878 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the establishment of Offices of Minority Health.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Proposed amendment SA 2878 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13833)
  14. S.Amdt.2871 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  15. S.Amdt.2826 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To protect and improve guaranteed Medicare benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2826 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 357.
  16. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  17. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)