Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.3145 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.2976 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2969 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2942 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To prevent Medicare from being raided for new entitlements and to use Medicare savings to save Medicare.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/06/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Proposed amendment SA 2942, under the order of 12/7/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12599)
  5. S.Amdt.2789 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)