Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.3101 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.2947 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.2928 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  4. S.Amdt.2862   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  5. S.Amdt.2828   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  6. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  7. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  8. S.Amdt.2789 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11