Limit your search

1-20 of 20
  1. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  2. S.Amdt.3173 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.3135 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  4. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  5. S.Amdt.3037 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  6. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 10
  7. S.Amdt.2947 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  8. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  9. S.Amdt.2923 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  10. S.Amdt.2921 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  11. S.Amdt.2905 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To modify the limit on excessive remuneration paid by certain health insurance providers to set the limit at the same levels as the salary of the President of the United States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/04/2009) (Proposed 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 12/06/09 Proposed amendment SA 2905 under the order of 12/5/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12541)
  12. S.Amdt.2884 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 8
  13. S.Amdt.2871 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  14. S.Amdt.2862   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  15. S.Amdt.2828   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  16. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  17. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  18. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.
  19. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11
  20. S.Amdt.2789 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11