Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  1. S.Amdt.3228 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3168 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3076 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.3073   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.3045 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2991 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2989 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.
  14. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)