Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.3256   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  3. S.Amdt.3185 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  4. S.Amdt.3162 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  6. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 10
  7. S.Amdt.2883 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4