Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.3276 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To improve the bill.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 12/19/2009) (Proposed 12/19/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/22/09 Amendment SA 3276 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 387.
  2. S.Amdt.2956 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2939 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To require the Secretary to provide information regarding enrollee satisfaction with qualified health plans offered through an Exchange through the Internet portal.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/05/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Amendment SA 2939, under the order of 12/7/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 367. (consideration: CR S12565)
  4. S.Amdt.2826 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To protect and improve guaranteed Medicare benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2826 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 357.
  5. S.Amdt.2792 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.
  7. S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 11/19/2009) (Proposed 11/21/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Amendment SA 2786 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 39. Record Vote Number: 394.
    Notes: Printed text [PDF] of Amendment No. 2786.