Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.3134 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.2962 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To prohibit the use of Federal funds for abortions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 12/07/2009) (Proposed 12/07/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/08/09 Motion to table amendment SA 2962 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 369. (consideration: CR S12683)
  3. S.Amdt.2927 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose Relative to limitation on amount of attorney's contingency fees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] (Submitted 12/05/2009) (Proposed 12/05/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/06/09 Proposed amendment SA 2927 under the order of 12/5/2009, not having achived 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12543)
  4. S.Amdt.2871 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2836 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To ensure patients receive doctor recommendations for preventive health services, including mammograms and cervical cancer screening, without interference from government or insurance company bureaucrats.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Proposed amendment SA 2836 under the order of 12/2/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12277)