Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  • S.Amdt.3068 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  • S.Amdt.2969 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  • S.Amdt.2962 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prohibit the use of Federal funds for abortions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 12/07/2009) (Proposed 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 12/08/09 Motion to table amendment SA 2962 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 369. (consideration: CR S12683)
  • S.Amdt.2942 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prevent Medicare from being raided for new entitlements and to use Medicare savings to save Medicare.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] (Submitted 12/06/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 13
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Proposed amendment SA 2942, under the order of 12/7/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12599)
  • S.Amdt.2836 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To ensure patients receive doctor recommendations for preventive health services, including mammograms and cervical cancer screening, without interference from government or insurance company bureaucrats.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Proposed amendment SA 2836 under the order of 12/2/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12277)
  • S.Amdt.2804 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1