Limit your search

1-19 of 19
  1. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  2. S.Amdt.3185 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  3. S.Amdt.3172 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.3085 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  5. S.Amdt.3076 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  6. S.Amdt.2999 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  7. S.Amdt.2994 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  8. S.Amdt.2993 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  9. S.Amdt.2991 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  10. S.Amdt.2989 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  11. S.Amdt.2939 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To require the Secretary to provide information regarding enrollee satisfaction with qualified health plans offered through an Exchange through the Internet portal.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/05/2009) (Proposed 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 12/07/09 Amendment SA 2939, under the order of 12/7/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 367. (consideration: CR S12565)
  12. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  13. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18
  14. S.Amdt.2884 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 8
  15. S.Amdt.2883 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  16. S.Amdt.2878 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the establishment of Offices of Minority Health.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Cosponsors: 10
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Proposed amendment SA 2878 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13833)
  17. S.Amdt.2828   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  18. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  19. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.