Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3185 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3045 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2991 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)