Limit your search

1-13 of 13
  1. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3098 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3069   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2996 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2923 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2886 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2884 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2862   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/15/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  12. S.Amdt.2792 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)