Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  1. S.Amdt.3264 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  2. S.Amdt.3239 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.3238 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  5. S.Amdt.3086 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 10
  7. S.Amdt.2944 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.2928 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  9. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18
  10. S.Amdt.2908 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  11. S.Amdt.2886 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  12. S.Amdt.2879 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  13. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  14. S.Amdt.2792 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6