Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  1. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3117 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3112 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3085 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2999 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2930 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2904 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2903 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2878 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the establishment of Offices of Minority Health.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Proposed amendment SA 2878 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13833)
  11. S.Amdt.2859 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)