Limit your search

1-9 of 9
  1. S.Amdt.2994 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2915 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2905 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To modify the limit on excessive remuneration paid by certain health insurance providers to set the limit at the same levels as the salary of the President of the United States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/04/2009) (Proposed 12/04/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/06/09 Proposed amendment SA 2905 under the order of 12/5/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12541)
  6. S.Amdt.2884 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2830 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.