Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.3045 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  2. S.Amdt.2994 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  3. S.Amdt.2910 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  4. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18
  5. S.Amdt.2869 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  6. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  7. S.Amdt.2792 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  8. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.