Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.3264 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  2. S.Amdt.3157 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.3136 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  4. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  5. S.Amdt.2995 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  6. S.Amdt.2994 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  7. S.Amdt.2978 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  8. S.Amdt.2940 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  9. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18
  10. S.Amdt.2903 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  11. S.Amdt.2849 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  12. S.Amdt.2848 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  13. S.Amdt.2847 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  14. S.Amdt.2846 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  15. S.Amdt.2845 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2