Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.3227 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2997 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2995 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2878 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the establishment of Offices of Minority Health.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Proposed amendment SA 2878 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13833)
  7. S.Amdt.2789 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)