Limit your search

1-4 of 4
  1. S.Amdt.3112 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3011 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2862   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/15/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)