Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.3180 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3082 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3068 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2882 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2807 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 12/02/2009)