Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.3067 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3065 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.3030 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  4. S.Amdt.2991 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  5. S.Amdt.2910 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  6. S.Amdt.2905 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To modify the limit on excessive remuneration paid by certain health insurance providers to set the limit at the same levels as the salary of the President of the United States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/04/2009) (Proposed 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
    Latest Action: 12/06/09 Proposed amendment SA 2905 under the order of 12/5/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S12541)
  7. S.Amdt.2869 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  8. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22