Limit your search

1-10 of 10
  1. S.Amdt.3076 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3045 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2918 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2910 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.2895 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2894 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2871 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2798 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)