Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.3173 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.3102 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  3. S.Amdt.3045 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  4. S.Amdt.3037 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  5. S.Amdt.2991 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  6. S.Amdt.2989 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  7. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  8. S.Amdt.2924 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  9. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18
  10. S.Amdt.2895 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  11. S.Amdt.2894 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  12. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  13. S.Amdt.2792 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  14. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.
  15. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11