Limit your search

1-19 of 19
  1. S.Amdt.3241 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
    Cosponsors: 22
  3. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 12
  4. S.Amdt.3014 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  5. S.Amdt.3013 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  6. S.Amdt.3012 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  7. S.Amdt.3011 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  8. S.Amdt.3010 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  9. S.Amdt.3009 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  10. S.Amdt.3008 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  11. S.Amdt.3007 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  12. S.Amdt.3006 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  13. S.Amdt.3005 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  14. S.Amdt.2943 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  15. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  16. S.Amdt.2869 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  17. S.Amdt.2826 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To protect and improve guaranteed Medicare benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2826 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 357.
  18. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  19. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.