Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.3263 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3112 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3078 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.3011 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.3010 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.3009 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.3008 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.3007 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.3006 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.3005 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2998 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  14. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/15/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  15. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.