Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.3264 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 12/17/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3235 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3228 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3215 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.3033 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2955 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2924 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2898 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2893 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2871 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  14. S.Amdt.2792 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  15. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.