Limit your search

1-23 of 23
  1. S.Amdt.3203 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  2. S.Amdt.3185 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/11/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  3. S.Amdt.3112 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  4. S.Amdt.3088 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.3085 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  6. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 12
  7. S.Amdt.3014 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  8. S.Amdt.3013 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  9. S.Amdt.3012 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  10. S.Amdt.2995 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 5
  11. S.Amdt.2973   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.2957 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  13. S.Amdt.2941 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  14. S.Amdt.2940 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  15. S.Amdt.2938 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 14
  16. S.Amdt.2924 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 4
  17. S.Amdt.2918 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  18. S.Amdt.2916 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  19. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 18
  20. S.Amdt.2895 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  21. S.Amdt.2869 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
    Cosponsors: 9
  22. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  23. S.Amdt.2791 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To clarify provisions relating to first dollar coverage for preventive services for women.
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 11/30/2009) (Proposed 11/30/2009)
    Cosponsors: 17
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2791 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 39. Record Vote Number: 355.