Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.2924 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.2923 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.2878 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the establishment of Offices of Minority Health.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/03/2009) (Proposed 12/22/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/23/09 Proposed amendment SA 2878 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13833)
  5. S.Amdt.2866 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2827 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)