Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.3068 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 7
  2. S.Amdt.2976 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 3
  3. S.Amdt.2969 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 6
  4. S.Amdt.2962 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To prohibit the use of Federal funds for abortions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] (Submitted 12/07/2009) (Proposed 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 12/08/09 Motion to table amendment SA 2962 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 369. (consideration: CR S12683)
  5. S.Amdt.2961 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Cosponsors: 20
    Latest Action: 12/16/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  7. S.Amdt.2789 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/21/2009)
    Cosponsors: 11