Limit your search

1-11 of 11
  1. S.Amdt.3256   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/16/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3240 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3238 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3228 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3136 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.3112 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.3088 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/09/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.3037 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.3011 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.3004 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2956 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 12/07/2009)