Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.3240 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 12/15/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3215 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 12/14/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3119 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3047 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3030 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2994 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2931 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] (Submitted 12/05/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2923 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2910 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2898 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2871 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2869 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/03/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)
  14. S.Amdt.2793 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To provide for the importation of prescription drugs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] (Submitted 12/01/2009) (Proposed 12/08/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/15/09 Proposed amendment SA 2793 under the order of 12/15/2009, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendement was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S13238)
  15. S.Amdt.2790 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/30/2009)