Limit your search

1-18 of 18
  1. S.Amdt.3136 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  2. S.Amdt.3118 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 12/10/2009)
  3. S.Amdt.3051 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  4. S.Amdt.3047 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  5. S.Amdt.3046 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 12/08/2009)
  6. S.Amdt.2996 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 12/07/2009)
  7. S.Amdt.2941 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
  8. S.Amdt.2940 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] (Submitted 12/06/2009)
  9. S.Amdt.2909 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  10. S.Amdt.2886 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  11. S.Amdt.2884 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 12/04/2009)
  12. S.Amdt.2849 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  13. S.Amdt.2848 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  14. S.Amdt.2847 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  15. S.Amdt.2846 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  16. S.Amdt.2845 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 12/02/2009)
  17. S.Amdt.2826 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Purpose To protect and improve guaranteed Medicare benefits.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 12/02/2009) (Proposed 12/03/2009)
    Latest Action: 12/03/09 Amendment SA 2826 under the order of 12/2/2009, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 357.
  18. S.Amdt.2795 to S.Amdt.2786   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 12/01/2009)